**Qs. 134 * 12=?**

**Write down the answer one figure at a time, from right to left as in any multiplication. Prefix a zero to the multiplicand so that it reads 0134.**

**0134**

**This method is exactly same as the previous method; here you double each number before adding the right neighbor. **

**134 * 12=?**

### Prefix a zero to the multiplicand so that it reads

**0134 * 12=?**

**Double 4 and add the right neighbor (there is no right neighbor to 4 so add 0)**

**4*2=8+0= 8**

### Move left double 3 and add the right neighbor 4

**3*2=6+4=10**

**Rest 0 and take 1 to the next number If in the process of addition, you get a two digit number, set down only the right digit and carry the left digit.**

### Double 1 and add the right neighbor 3 and the brought forward 1 from earlier

**1*2=2+3+1=6**

**Double 0 and add the right neighbor 1**

**0*2=0+1=1**

**There fore 134 * 12= 1608**

**You can check it through conventional; multiplication. **

**Another example**

**13*12=?**

**013*12**

**6**

**5**

**1**

**= 156**

**You can check it through yours conventional method.**